MN SF3063 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2819
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2819
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Snowmobile and off-highway vehicle provisions violations civil penalties increase
Title
Snowmobile and off-highway vehicle provisions violations civil penalties increase
Sponsors
Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. David Senjem [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2819 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Chief author added Ruud |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Johnson |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author stricken Rarick |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2819 (Similar To) 2022-04-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 46