MN SF3055 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author stricken Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author stricken Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
White Bear Lake groundwater appropriation permits issuance modification; east metropolitan communities safe drinking water recommendations that supports both growth and sustainability establishment
Title
White Bear Lake groundwater appropriation permits issuance modification; east metropolitan communities safe drinking water recommendations that supports both growth and sustainability establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Author stricken Wiger |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3880 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed