MN SF3020 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
North Branch public utilities commission membership increase authorization
Title
North Branch public utilities commission membership increase authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 102 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-05 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3242 |
2020-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3242 (Similar To) 2020-05-05 - HF indefinitely postponed