MN SF3019 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insulin safety net program establishment; health plan companies enrollees with dependent children notification requirement; appropriations
Title
Insulin safety net program establishment; health plan companies enrollees with dependent children notification requirement; appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Chief author added Jensen |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Pratt |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Author stricken Benson |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4092 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce