MN SF3017 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Aging board self-directed caregiver grants requirements modifications
Title
Aging board self-directed caregiver grants requirements modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3074 |
2020-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Authors added Eken; Koran |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Family Care and Aging |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3074 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed