MN SF3017 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Policy
Pending: Senate E-12 Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Policy
Pending: Senate E-12 Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unclaimed drugs and medications school district collection and transportation authorization
Title
Unclaimed drugs and medications school district collection and transportation authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. Chris Eaton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Policy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Authors added Anderson, B.; Clausen; Eaton |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Policy |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3533 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance