MN SF2989 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added McEwen; Bigham
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added McEwen; Bigham
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth intervention programs appropriation
Title
Youth intervention programs appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Authors added McEwen; Bigham |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3304 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Author added Vang