MN SF297 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Task Force on Human Services Background Study Eligibility creation; appropriations
Title
Legislative Task Force on Human Services Background Study Eligibility creation; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Licensing Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1825 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy