MN SF2959 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Semiautomatic military-style assault weapon minimum age to possess raised; semiautomatic military-style assault weapon definition expansion; semiautomatic military-style assault weapon transfer to underage persons crime
Title
Semiautomatic military-style assault weapon minimum age to possess raised; semiautomatic military-style assault weapon definition expansion; semiautomatic military-style assault weapon transfer to underage persons crime
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Richard Cohen [D] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Author added Cohen |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Authors added Laine; Dziedzic |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3516 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Author added Youakim.