MN SF2922 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collection agencies governing licensure and registration provisions modification; collection and maintenance of certain information regarding credit counseling services by the commissioner of commerce requirement
Title
Collection agencies governing licensure and registration provisions modification; collection and maintenance of certain information regarding credit counseling services by the commissioner of commerce requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 70 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-05-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-17 | House | Amended |
2022-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 17, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-12 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4048 |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4048 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Author added Bernardy