MN SF2908 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
State-County Results, Accountability and Service Delivery Reform Act modifications; physical education academic standards requirement; healthy kids awards program establishment; nursing facilities additional local share requirement; nursing facility rate phase-in alternative
Title
State-County Results, Accountability and Service Delivery Reform Act modifications; physical education academic standards requirement; healthy kids awards program establishment; nursing facilities additional local share requirement; nursing facility rate phase-in alternative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-16 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-05-16 | House: Motion for reconsideration | |
2010-05-16 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-16 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Senate concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3055 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |