MN SF2892 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3202
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3202
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital construction moratorium exception modification for level 1 trauma center in Ramsey County; public interest review process deadlines imposition
Title
Hospital construction moratorium exception modification for level 1 trauma center in Ramsey County; public interest review process deadlines imposition
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3202 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3202 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 199