MN SF2889 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Authors added Tomassoni; Eaton
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disability waiver rate system modification under medical assistance (MA)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability waiver rate system modification under medical assistance (MA)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateAuthors added Tomassoni; Eaton
2018-03-12SenateAuthor added Newton
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2018-03-01SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3191 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Author added Grossell.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback