MN SF2881 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Indigenous Peoples' Day holiday establishment and school observance requirement; Christopher Columbus Day as a state holiday elimination
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day holiday establishment and school observance requirement; Christopher Columbus Day as a state holiday elimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2856 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Author added Morrison