MN SF2863 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvements appropriation
Title
Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvements appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2855 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division