MN SF2845 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health creation and transferring of duties of a state agency
Title
Department of Behavioral Health creation and transferring of duties of a state agency
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3086 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Albright