MN SF2841 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2849
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2849
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Argosy University closure student relief authorization
Title
Argosy University closure student relief authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2849 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Joint rule 2.03 suspended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2849 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 34 05/17/2019