MN SF2762 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 141 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 141 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ramsey county nursing facilities construction project rate increase
Title
Ramsey county nursing facilities construction project rate increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 141 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 123-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2920 |
2018-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2920 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - HF indefinitely postponed