MN SF2758 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Matthews
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Matthews
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax rate reduction
Title
Individual income tax rate reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Matthews |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2968 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Author added Scott