MN SF2758 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taking and feeding wild animals provisions modifications
Title
Taking and feeding wild animals provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Schmit [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2844 (Similar To) 2016-05-17 - Referred to Finance