MN SF2734 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Eaton
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Eaton
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Noncompliant driver's license (consular identification) or state identification card requirements and provisions modifications and appropriation
Title
Noncompliant driver's license (consular identification) or state identification card requirements and provisions modifications and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] |
Sen. Chris Eaton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Author added Eaton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Author added Torres Ray |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2735 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Author added Elkins