MN SF2704 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation network companies regulation
Title
Transportation network companies regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Author stricken Tomassoni |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Local Government |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3032 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance