MN SF2695 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitality recovery grant program establishment
Title
Hospitality recovery grant program establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authors added Newton; Rest |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4068 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy