MN SF2684 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2497, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus Education appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus Education appropriations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-21SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2497, SF indefinitely postponed
2023-04-20SenateSecond reading
2023-04-20SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report
2023-04-19SenateRule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
2023-04-19SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-04-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2023-04-04SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2023-03-07SenateReferred to Education Finance
2023-03-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2497 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 55

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback