MN SF2678 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacists administration of drugs through intramuscular and subcutaneous administration establishment; pharmacist placement of drug monitoring devices authorization
Title
Pharmacists administration of drugs through intramuscular and subcutaneous administration establishment; pharmacist placement of drug monitoring devices authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2768 |
2022-05-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2768 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - HF indefinitely postponed