MN SF2673 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - House conferees Mariani; Becker-Finn; Moller; Frazier; Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - House conferees Mariani; Becker-Finn; Moller; Frazier; Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus public safety policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus public safety policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - S2673A4 (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: 63 - Amendment to Amendment - Nays (Y: 67 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - S2673A5 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - S2673A13 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment - S2673A8 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - S2673A4 (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: 63 - Amendment to Amendment - Nays (Y: 67 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - S2673A5 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - S2673A13 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment - S2673A8 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | House conferees Mariani; Becker-Finn; Moller; Frazier; Johnson |
2022-05-05 | House | House conferees Mariani, Becker-Finn, Moller, Frazier, Johnson |
2022-05-05 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate conferees Limmer; Osmek; Matthews; Latz; Bigham |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate conferees Limmer; Osmek; Mathews; Latz; Bigham |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-04-29 | House | Amended |
2022-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 29, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-27 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-04-26 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4608 |
2022-04-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3894 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Author added Poston