MN SF2670 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Lang
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Lang
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide public safety radio communication system equipment grants appropriation
Title
Statewide public safety radio communication system equipment grants appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Author added Lang |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2821 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Franke