MN SF2665 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment trust fund replenishment; unemployment base tax rate, assessment, and taxable wage bases freeze authorization; COVID-19 related claims exclusion from the employer experience rating from certain calendar years authorization; appropriating money
Title
Unemployment trust fund replenishment; unemployment base tax rate, assessment, and taxable wage bases freeze authorization; COVID-19 related claims exclusion from the employer experience rating from certain calendar years authorization; appropriating money
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2728 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Authors added Demuth, Franke, Swedzinski, Burkel, Poston, Bennett, Dettmer, Lueck