MN SF2662 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Birth defect information system modifications
Title
Birth defect information system modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3689 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3689 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 152