MN SF2656 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Lieske
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact creation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact creation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenateAuthor added Lieske
2024-03-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
2024-02-12SenateAuthor added Hoffman
2023-03-06SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-06SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2738 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback