MN SF2653 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Cohen
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

St. Paul college savings account creation at birth grant; reporting; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Paul college savings account creation at birth grant; reporting; appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateAuthor added Cohen
2019-03-26SenateAuthor added Frentz
2019-03-25SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-03-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2201 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback