MN SF2652 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Author added Rosen
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Author added Rosen
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's cabinet system redesign; basic sliding fee child care program modification; early learning scholarship eligibility modification and appropriation
Title
Children's cabinet system redesign; basic sliding fee child care program modification; early learning scholarship eligibility modification and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3632 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform