MN SF2646 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3157
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3157
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real property owners liability immunity for providing assistance animals access; animal misrepresentation as service animal crime establishment
Title
Real property owners liability immunity for providing assistance animals access; animal misrepresentation as service animal crime establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3157 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3157 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 106 04/26/18