MN SF2644 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eastern Carver County Schools transportation hub lease levy authorization
Title
Eastern Carver County Schools transportation hub lease levy authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2669 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance