MN SF2644 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2697
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2697
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Claims against the state; department of corrections appropriation
Title
Claims against the state; department of corrections appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2697 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2697 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 51