MN SF2611 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2208
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus jobs and economic development appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus jobs and economic development appropriations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2208
2019-04-24SenateSecond reading
2019-04-24SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-04-10SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
2019-03-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2208 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Author added Bernardy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback