MN SF2611 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
University of Minnesota regent candidate advisory council replacement by legislative commission on regent selection
Title
University of Minnesota regent candidate advisory council replacement by legislative commission on regent selection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3372 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Second reading