MN SF2592 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unlimited Social Security subtraction
Title
Unlimited Social Security subtraction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2999 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Author added Franson