MN SF2585 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ionizing radiation-producing equipment security screening systems addition authorization; appropriation
Title
Ionizing radiation-producing equipment security screening systems addition authorization; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3338 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance