MN SF2563 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF2956
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF2956
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Highway land conveyance to Indian tribal governments authorization
Title
Highway land conveyance to Indian tribal governments authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Kubly [D] | Sen. Steven Murphy [D] | Rep. Mark Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF2956 | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Consent Calendar: Stricken, placed on General Orders | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended, Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Transportation |