MN SF2551 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural finance authority bond issue and appropriation
Title
Rural finance authority bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Capital Investment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2882 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiel.