MN SF2550 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2982
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2982
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural research data maintained by University of Minnesota (U of M) classification
Title
Agricultural research data maintained by University of Minnesota (U of M) classification
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2982 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2982 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 140 05/17/18