MN SF2535 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Mining and Forestry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Mining and Forestry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonferrous permits to mine financial assurance requirements modifications
Title
Nonferrous permits to mine financial assurance requirements modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Johnson Stewart [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Author added Cwodzinski |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Mining and Forestry Policy |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2636 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Freiberg