MN SF2505 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added Osmek
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added Osmek
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Job skills training for recently released inmates appropriation
Title
Job skills training for recently released inmates appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Author added Osmek |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |