MN SF2491 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Catalytic converters purchase requirements establishment
Title
Catalytic converters purchase requirements establishment
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-21 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Author added Torres Ray |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2603 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Authors added Edelson, Morrison