MN SF2491 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State and local government settlement accountability and transparency establishment; harassment data disclosure to complainant of sexual harassment investigations
Title
State and local government settlement accountability and transparency establishment; harassment data disclosure to complainant of sexual harassment investigations
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Joint rule 2.03 suspended, bill to pass as amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Authors added Ruud; Kiffmeyer; Housley |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3034 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy