MN SF2485 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Commercial health plan coverage requirement of certain treatment at psychiatric residential treatment facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial health plan coverage requirement of certain treatment at psychiatric residential treatment facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-22SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection
2023-03-02SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-02SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2371 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback