MN SF2470 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF2639
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Kelsey Smith Act; wireless telecommunications service providers to provide call locations for emergencies requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kelsey Smith Act; wireless telecommunications service providers to provide call locations for emergencies requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF2639
2010-03-11 Senate: Second reading
2010-03-11 Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended
2010-02-25 Senate: Author added Sparks
2010-02-25 Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
2010-02-22 Senate: Authors added Sheran; Rummel
2010-02-08 Senate: Introduction and first reading
2010-02-08 Senate: Referred to Energy, Utilities, Technology and Communications

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback