MN SF2464 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress
Title
A resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2140 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Authors added Jurgens and Backer