MN SF2444 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance
Pending: Senate Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools requirement to maintain a supply of opiate antagonists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools requirement to maintain a supply of opiate antagonists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance
2023-03-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
2023-03-02SenateReferred to Education Finance
2023-03-02SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2398 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Author added Freiberg

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback